This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/24/2022 at 06:11:15 (UTC).

DOMINIQUE, ALEXANDRE vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 DOMINIQUE, ALEXANDRE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1318

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOMINIQUE, ALEXANDRE

DOMINIQUE, ONESE

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WISNIEWSKI, BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

1 BECK, LAUREN 2 MISHALI, JEREMY M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/22/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

7/22/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/22/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

7/22/2022: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/22/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DEFENDANT

8/10/2022: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

8/25/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - DISCOVERY (DEF)

9/19/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - DISCOVERY (DEF)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - DISCOVERY (DEF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WISNIEWSKI, BRIAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: BECK, LAUREN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: WISNIEWSKI, BRIAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CA001318, WISNIEWSKI, BRIAN VS. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-7/22/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WISNIEWSKI, BRIAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/22/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000056905 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 153855009 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220722235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant