This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/19/2023 at 12:38:38 (UTC).

WIMBERLY, VALERIE vs. CASTLE KEY INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 WIMBERLY, VALERIE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASTLE KEY INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARONICKI, BRETT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2357

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARONICKI, BRETT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WIMBERLY, VALERIE

Defendant

CASTLE KEY INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLESTER, MINDY

Defendant Attorney

REGAL, STEVE AUSTIN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/19/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/19/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT

12/19/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REPLY IN AVOIDANCE

3/8/2023: REPLY IN AVOIDANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

2/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

2/24/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/24/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/24/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

2/24/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

2/24/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

2/16/2023: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/16/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

2/10/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME

1/23/2023: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY IN AVOIDANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MCLESTER, MINDY ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA002357

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000096428 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 163285683 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20221219235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less