Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 02:42:56 (UTC).

WILLS, RODNEY vs. WILLS, CHRISTIAN

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 WILLS, RODNEY filed an Other lawsuit against WILLS, CHRISTIAN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0867

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLS, ZENAIDA

WILLS, RODNEY

Defendant

WILLS, CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

4/12/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

4/9/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS

4/9/2021: UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

4/9/2021: COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000028658; Applied Amount; $312.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $312.00 RECEIPT #2021000028658

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSMALL PHOTOGRAPHIC COPIES ASSESSED $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFILING CLAIM > $2500 ASSESSED $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CC000867

    Read MoreRead Less