This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 06:46:58 (UTC).

WELLS, TAMIAYIA AMIRAYIA vs. GARDNER, DEONDRE JAMARIOUS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 WELLS, TAMIAYIA AMIRAYIA filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against GARDNER, DEONDRE JAMARIOUS. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEISEY, MICHAEL C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1826

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEISEY, MICHAEL C

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WELLS, TAMIAYIA AMIRAYIA

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Respondent

GARDNER, DEONDRE JAMARIOUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/09/2023

DocketNOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022

DocketOA40 - FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER - RECORDED (OTHER.4901.850. / 5108647)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

DocketINCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

DocketOA40 - FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFO SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

DocketLETTER TO THE CLERK (OA86) CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST (CS-OA86)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

DocketGT REPORT IN PATERNITY CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE HEISEY, MICHAEL C: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketCASE FILED 07/20/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR001826

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketNOTICE OF PROCEEDING TO ESTABLISH ADMIN SUPPORT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFO SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketLETTER TO THE CLERK (OA86) CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST (CS-OA86)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less