This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/06/2021 at 16:10:52 (UTC).

WEIR PR, FAY vs. STEWARD SEBASTIAN RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 WEIR PR, FAY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against STEWARD SEBASTIAN RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1603

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEIR PR, FAY

Defendants

STEWARD MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

COMPREHENSIVE HOSPITALISTS OF FLORIDA, LLC

MURPHY, NP, JOANNE

WATSON, MD, MICHAEL

MEDVEDEV, MD, EUGENE

PIERRE, MD, EDECK

BELL, MD, JOHN

SNH SE TENANTS TRS, INC. D/B/A THE GARDENS OF PORT

SCHUMACHER MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

STEWARD SEBASTIAN RIVER MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

SNH SE TENANTS TRS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

URBANEK, SHARON BIDKA

FORMAN, THEODORE STANLEY

Defendant Attorneys

PEREZ, THERESA CHRISTINE

FORD, RICHARDS HUFF

TELAN, PATRICK HARMAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/29/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/29/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/29/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/21/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL & STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION & STAY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - SECOND AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR COUNT II & GRANTING AS TO COUNTS XI - XIV ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020000076978 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 115817768 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201029235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020000076980 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 115818187 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201029235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: FORMAN, THEODORE STANLEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000075358; Applied Amount; $412.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $412.50 RECEIPT #2020000075358 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 115379235 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201022235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001603

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHUMACHER MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STEWARD MEDICAL GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORMAN, THEODORE STANLEY