This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 12/31/2020 at 20:46:42 (UTC).

WEINGARTEN, LORRAINE S vs. PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Case Summary

On 05/29/2012 WEINGARTEN, LORRAINE S filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEIGER, DWIGHT L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2143

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEIGER, DWIGHT L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEINGARTEN, LORRAINE S

WEINGARTEN, ROBERT

Defendant

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WADE, RICHARD S

Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON, GREGORY T

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

9/11/2013: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

8/27/2013: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

7/20/2013: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

7/9/2013: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/27/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUPLMNTL REQ TO PRODUCE

2/28/2013: SUPLMNTL REQ TO PRODUCE

NTC OF TAKING DEPO

12/26/2012: NTC OF TAKING DEPO

NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY

9/19/2012: NTC OF PROD FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

8/9/2012: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/9/2013: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/27/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

6/7/2013: NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION

4/23/2013: NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION

NTC OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO

3/4/2013: NTC OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

11/16/2012: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

10/10/2012: CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION

NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

8/28/2012: NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6/29/2012: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney RICHARD S WADE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney GREGORY T ANDERSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3596.923 / 3916222)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GEIGER, DWIGHT L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321122067; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, Gregory T, ESQ.