This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/23/2021 at 07:09:06 (UTC).

WATTS, DAVID vs. ERIKSEN, SOPHIA

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 WATTS, DAVID filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERIKSEN, SOPHIA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1407

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATTS, DAVID

Defendants

ERIKSEN, SOPHIA

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN KEUREN, PETER SCOTT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

1/19/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/13/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/13/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

10/13/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

COMPLAINT AMENDED ( V )

10/13/2020: COMPLAINT AMENDED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/18/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney PETER SCOTT VAN KEUREN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000072919; Applied Amount; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: VAN KEUREN, PETER SCOTT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001407, WATTS, DAVID VS. ERIKSEN, SOPHIA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/14/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020000072919 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 114911759 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201014235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: VAN KEUREN, PETER SCOTT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065746 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113611980 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001407

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN KEUREN, PETER SCOTT