This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/18/2020 at 13:15:53 (UTC).

WALKER, VICTOR vs. ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 WALKER, VICTOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1444

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALKER, RACHEL H

WALKER, VICTOR

Defendant

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHULZ, SEAN PAUL

ARIAS, ISABEL

Defendant Attorney

DEHNE, ROBERT B

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

10/4/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V )

8/21/2019: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

8/9/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

8/9/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

7/24/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

7/23/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

7/23/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

7/23/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

7/23/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

7/23/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

7/23/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2019
  • DocketAttorney SEAN PAUL SCHULZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2019
  • DocketAttorney SEAN PAUL SCHULZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2019
  • DocketAttorney ISABEL ARIAS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2019
  • DocketAttorney ROBERT B DEHNE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SCHULZ, SEAN PAUL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/24/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001444

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000061399 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 93037039 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190724235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less