Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 11/20/2020 at 23:14:34 (UTC).

VERO ATLANTIC 2 LLC vs. TARPON IV LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 VERO ATLANTIC 2 LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TARPON IV LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1203

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERO ATLANTIC 2 LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE 637 NW BAYSHORE BLVD REVOCABLE TRUST

UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF THE DAVEY F VANDERHOFF LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 27, 2006 AS AMENDED FEBRUARY 27, 2008

UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF THE MAINVILLE FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MAY 19, 2000

TARPON IV LLC

UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF THE 637 NW BAYSHORE BLVD REVOCABLE TRUST

CLARK, CYNTHIA

BANKS, WILLIAM

SMITH, ENJOLI

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE DAVEY F. VANDERHOFF LIVING TRUST

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DAVEY F VANDERHOFF

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE MAINVILLE FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MAY 19, 2000

ESTATE OF DAVEY F VANDERHOFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOKOLOF, OWEN HARVEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED ( V )

11/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED ( V )

MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY ( V )

11/12/2020: MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

11/12/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

11/9/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

11/9/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

10/2/2020: NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

9/28/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/28/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/28/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/26/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT

8/17/2020: COMPLAINT

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 12/07/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SOKOLOF, OWEN HARVEY - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001203, VERO ATLANTIC 2 LLC VS. TARPON IV LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-11/10/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS EXTRA NAMES ASSESSED $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $17.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SOKOLOF, OWEN HARVEY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketMF 50,000 OR LESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/17/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001203

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERO ATLANTIC 2, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY is a litigant

Latest cases where TARPON IV, LLC is a litigant