This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 09/07/2022 at 04:14:35 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs. JOSEPH, MARLINE

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSEPH, MARLINE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2035

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

JOSEPH, MARLINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/9/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/9/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/9/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MARCADIS, RALPH SAM - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CC002035, VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC VS. JOSEPH, MARLINE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/11/2022,NCICL-8/11/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY CLARIFICATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MARCADIS, RALPH SAM ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022000062332 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 155004934 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220811235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/10/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CC002035

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S