This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 04:00:36 (UTC).

VALLEJOS, CEDRIC JOSEPH vs. SMITH, AMBER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 VALLEJOS, CEDRIC JOSEPH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SMITH, AMBER. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAUER, SHERWOOD JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3013

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALLEJOS, CEDRIC JOSEPH

Respondent

SMITH, AMBER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketORDER DENYING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FRM NONLAWYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMEMO TO SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMCIR WAIVED INDIGENT $10.0000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCIVFIL CHAPTERS WAIVED INDIGENT $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCIVFIL CHAPTERS ASSESSED $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR003013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less