Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/11/2021 at 00:34:56 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. ARGONA, SALLY A

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ARGONA, SALLY A. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1201

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

ARGONA, SALLY A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SALLY A ARGONA

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ADAM A ARGONA

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

ULFARSSON, BJORN

WASTE PRO U S A

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

ARGONA, ADAM A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD, HARRIS SETH

Defendant Attorneys

ZACKS, DUSTIN A

BAGGETT, LEE JAMES

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ( V )

11/25/2020: DEFAULT ( V )

REPLY ( V )

11/12/2020: REPLY ( V )

REPLY ( V )

11/12/2020: REPLY ( V )

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

10/28/2020: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

9/22/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/1/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/1/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

9/1/2020: ANSWER ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

8/31/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/28/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PAYMENT $1,043.50 RECEIPT #2020000057814

8/20/2020: PAYMENT $1,043.50 RECEIPT #2020000057814

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/18/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

8/13/2020: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

COMPLAINT

8/13/2020: COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

8/13/2020: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HOWARD, HARRIS SETH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001201, US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. ARGONA, SALLY A - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-11/25/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001201

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE PRO USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant