Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/24/2020 at 07:54:00 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. LOPEZ, ARLENE R

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LOPEZ, ARLENE R. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRMAN, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2365

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MIRMAN, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

CLERK OF COURT ST LUCIE COUNTY FL

CACH LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT #1 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ARLENE R LOPEZ

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

LOPEZ, ARLENE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDERSON, CHARLOTTE S

MULLIN, HILLARY RENEE

Defendant Attorneys

BAGGETT, LEE JAMES

POPRAWSKI, SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

ZACHEM, BETTY C

WALKER, TRAVIS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

2/26/2020: MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

9/6/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - Recorded (Other.4284.1908 / 4582352) ( V )

6/18/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - Recorded (Other.4284.1908 / 4582352) ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE ( V )

6/18/2019: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE ( V )

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ( V )

6/13/2019: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ( V )

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - PLTF ( V )

4/30/2019: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - PLTF ( V )

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ( V )

3/25/2019: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY ( V )

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V )

3/18/2019: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

2/13/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

2/13/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/30/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

1/24/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

1/24/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

ANSWER- FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION ( V )

1/22/2019: ANSWER- FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION ( V )

ANSWER - CITY OF PSL ( V )

1/17/2019: ANSWER - CITY OF PSL ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/26/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/26/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/26/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000018980; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020000018980 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 103926544 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200227235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney HILLARY RENEE MULLIN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney LEE JAMES BAGGETT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney BETTY C ZACHEM - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/21/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CA002365

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of the Court of Brwd Cty is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant