Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 22:26:19 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. HURTADO, LAURA

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HURTADO, LAURA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0067

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

HURTADO, LAURA

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE COPORATION A PUBLIC CORPORATION

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

LARRY NEESE LLC

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LAURA HURTADO

HURTADO, FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATEL, PRATIK R

STORRINGS, JASON A

SAEED, AAMIR HAYAT

FULLER, SHANE

JORDAN, MIGDALIA

FORCE, STEVEN L

GALIPAULT, JOANNE MARY

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF NON-JURY TRIAL ( V )

11/4/2019: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF NON-JURY TRIAL ( V )

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - PLTF'S AMENDED ( V )

10/25/2019: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - PLTF'S AMENDED ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

9/23/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

7/31/2019: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V )

2/26/2019: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

2/20/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

ANSWER ( V )

2/1/2019: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/29/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

1/9/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

2/14/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

NOTICE OF SALE ( V )

2/4/2020: NOTICE OF SALE ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4376.1581 / 4668676) ( V )

1/30/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4376.1581 / 4668676) ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE ( V )

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF MORTGAGE ( V )

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

1/29/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

1/29/2020: CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST- AMENDED ( V )

1/8/2020: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST- AMENDED ( V )

WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - AMENDED ( V )

12/18/2019: WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - AMENDED ( V )

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: stlucie.clerkauction.com; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAttorney MIGDALIA JORDAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAttorney SHANE FULLER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAttorney AAMIR HAYAT SAEED - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAttorney JOANNE MARY GALIPAULT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAttorney STEVEN L FORCE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000011272; Applied Amount; $130.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketMF 50,000 OR LESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/09/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000067

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORDAN MIGDALIA