This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 07/28/2020 at 05:26:32 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. BROOME, DAVID E

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against BROOME, DAVID E. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0260

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPER

BROOME, DAVID E

BROOME, RHODA I

AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SEIDEN, JEFFREY MICHAEL

FORCE, STEVEN L

SAEED, AAMIR HAYAT

STORRINGS, JASON A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

4/6/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

DEFAULT

3/31/2020: DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

3/31/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

3/31/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

3/31/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

3/19/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

3/19/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

3/19/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

3/19/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/11/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/11/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

2/11/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

2/11/2020: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

2/11/2020: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

2/11/2020: LIS PENDENS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/11/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/11/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SEIDEN, JEFFREY MICHAEL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000260, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. BROOME, DAVID E - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-3/31/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less