This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/25/2021 at 03:55:10 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE vs. CHMURA, MARGARET M

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE filed an Other lawsuit against CHMURA, MARGARET M. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1402

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

CHMURA, MARGARET M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYATT, MARLON CHRISTOPHER

VALIATHODATHIL, PRINCY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

3/22/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4561.1347 / 4823598) ( V )

2/25/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4561.1347 / 4823598) ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

1/29/2021: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

NOTICE OF SALE - BLANK ( V )

1/29/2021: NOTICE OF SALE - BLANK ( V )

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING ( V )

1/12/2021: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

1/12/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

1/5/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/25/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

11/18/2020: DEFAULT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

11/18/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

11/18/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

10/30/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

10/26/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4479.768 / 4756841) ( V )

9/21/2020: LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4479.768 / 4756841) ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

9/21/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: stlucie.clerkauction.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: TELEPHONIC HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4561.1347 / 4823598) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 04/13/2021 AT 8:00 AM IN ONLINE/ , : FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $930.00 RECEIPT #2020000065739 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113605409 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001402

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marlon C. Hyatt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valiathodathil, Princy