Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/10/2020 at 07:05:26 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. COTTRELL, BENITA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COTTRELL, BENITA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2211

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

BOBBITT, PARMA JO

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PARMA JO BOBBITT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BENITA COTTRELL A/K/A B COTTREL

COTTRELL, BENITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRIMM, GWENETH M

TAUB, IVY J

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

MESSINA, PAUL M JR

TOPPER, NICOLE RORY

RABIDEAU, MICHAEL THOMAS

LEWIS, COREY MICHAEL

CONFREDA, RALPH W JR

Defendant Attorney

STEELE, W TRENT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

2/6/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ( V )

1/15/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

1/15/2020: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ( V )

11/12/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ( V )

COURT NOTES

10/25/2019: COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

10/2/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

9/24/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

8/22/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

2/8/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

12/19/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

12/19/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

12/18/2018: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/17/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

12/6/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

11/29/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

11/28/2018: COMPLAINT ( V )

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney PAUL M MESSINA JR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney JONATHAN IAN MEISELS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney NICOLE RORY TOPPER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney MICHAEL THOMAS RABIDEAU - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney W TRENT STEELE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $958.00 RECEIPT #2018000090965 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 81359118 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20181129235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/28/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018CA002211

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELE, W TRENT