This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/06/2021 at 03:43:56 (UTC).

TUCKER, DENNIS vs. ATLANTIC COAST RECYCLING CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 TUCKER, DENNIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ATLANTIC COAST RECYCLING CENTER INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1584

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TUCKER, DENNIS

Defendant

ATLANTIC COAST RECYCLING CENTER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN

Defendant Attorneys

ROONEY, J GARRY

JACKSON, JERMAINE K

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

3/26/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

3/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

3/24/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/24/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

3/16/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

3/11/2021: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

3/3/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/2/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

2/26/2021: ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

2/26/2021: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/25/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

COMPLAINT- AMENDED ( V )

1/27/2021: COMPLAINT- AMENDED ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

1/11/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

12/21/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/12/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/20/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/20/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 04/20/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/20/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001584

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000074760 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 115254473 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201020235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC COAST RECYCLING CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN