Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/11/2021 at 06:10:30 (UTC).

TRADITION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC vs. VICTORIA 149 LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 TRADITION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against VICTORIA 149 LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0357

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRADITION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

TENANT, UNKNOWN

VICTORIA 149 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISENBERG, AMY O

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

3/24/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

3/17/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4562.714 / 4824203) ( V )

2/26/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4562.714 / 4824203) ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

2/25/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/25/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000016233; Applied Amount; $425.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4562.714 / 4824203) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: EISENBERG, AMY O - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA000357, TRADITION COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC VS. VICTORIA 149 LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/26/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: EISENBERG, AMY O ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $425.00 RECEIPT #2021000016233 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 122087649 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210226235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000357

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRADITIONS COMMUNITY ASSN INC is a litigant