This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 01:31:01 (UTC).

THOMPSON, VALERIE vs. HODGES, JEROME V

Case Summary

On 06/21/2006 THOMPSON, VALERIE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HODGES, JEROME V. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALSH, THOMAS J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1696

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALSH, THOMAS J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON, VALERIE

Defendant

HODGES, JEROME V

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

6/21/2006: PETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

EVICTION SUMMONS:JEROME V HODGES & ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS (RET 28-JUN-2006 SER 21-JUN-2006)

6/21/2006: EVICTION SUMMONS:JEROME V HODGES & ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS (RET 28-JUN-2006 SER 21-JUN-2006)

RETURN OF SERVICE

6/28/2006: RETURN OF SERVICE

NTC OF LACK OF PROSECUTION:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 02-AUG-2007 BY DEBBIED.

8/2/2007: NTC OF LACK OF PROSECUTION:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 02-AUG-2007 BY DEBBIED.

NOTICE OF HEARING:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 01-OCT-2007 BY DEBBIED.

10/1/2007: NOTICE OF HEARING:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 01-OCT-2007 BY DEBBIED.

DISMISSED LACK OF PROSECUTION:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 09-NOV-2007 BY DEBBIED.

11/9/2007: DISMISSED LACK OF PROSECUTION:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 09-NOV-2007 BY DEBBIED.

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2007

DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2007
View Court Documents

DocketDISMISSED LACK OF PROSECUTION:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 09-NOV-2007 BY DEBBIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

HearingEvent: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Judge: WALSH, THOMAS J; Location: Courtroom K - SC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2007
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 01-OCT-2007 BY DEBBIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2007
View Court Documents

DocketNTC OF LACK OF PROSECUTION:DOCKET ENTRY FOR THE LETTER PRODUCED FROM GUAGMNU ON 02-AUG-2007 BY DEBBIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2006
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2006
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS:JEROME V HODGES & ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS (RET 28-JUN-2006 SER 21-JUN-2006)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2006

DocketSTYLE OF CASE:VALERIE THOMPSON VS JEROME V HODGES & ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2006

DocketASSIGNED TO JUDGE WALSH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2006
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less