This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/04/2020 at 08:45:03 (UTC).

THOMPSON, ROBERT L vs. GROUP ONE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 THOMPSON, ROBERT L filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GROUP ONE CONSTRUCTION DEVELOPMENT INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2038

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON, ROBERT L

Defendant

GROUP ONE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADFORD, LYMAN SHERWOOD IV

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/25/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - M

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - M

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - L

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - L

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - J

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - J

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - I

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - I

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - H

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - H

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - G

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - G

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - B

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - B

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/25/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

1/17/2020: DEFAULT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

1/15/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

1/15/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

12/16/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/28/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - K

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - K

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - D

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - D

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - C

10/25/2019: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - C

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/25/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: BRADFORD, LYMAN SHERWOOD IV - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA002038, THOMPSON, ROBERT L VS. GROUP ONE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-1/17/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000088687; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: BRADFORD, LYMAN SHERWOOD IV - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA002038, THOMPSON, ROBERT L VS. GROUP ONE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/28/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING -A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BRADFORD, LYMAN SHERWOOD IV ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/25/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002038

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000088687 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 97869448 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191025235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less