This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/25/2021 at 09:38:05 (UTC).

THOMAS, ELIZABETH RENE vs. GUERRERO, RYAN MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 11/13/2013 THOMAS, ELIZABETH RENE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GUERRERO, RYAN MATTHEW. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A, BRONIS, BARBARA W and HEISEY, MICHAEL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3161

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

BRONIS, BARBARA W

HEISEY, MICHAEL C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOMAS, ELIZABETH RENE

Respondent

GUERRERO, RYAN MATTHEW

Not Yet Classified

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS

3/31/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS

PARENTING PLAN

11/13/2013: PARENTING PLAN

PARENTING PLAN

1/29/2014: PARENTING PLAN

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V )

2/13/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V )

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

6/24/2014: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS

5/16/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS

NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

1/14/2014: NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF FILING FAMILY FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

1/10/2014: NOTICE OF FILING FAMILY FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF FILING PARENTING CERTIFICATE

12/13/2013: NOTICE OF FILING PARENTING CERTIFICATE

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE HEISEY, MICHAEL C: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2013DR003161, THOMAS, ELIZABETH RENE VS. GUERRERO, RYAN MATTHEW - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MMOD-12/9/2019"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR MODIFICATION-NON IVD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TERMINATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney CHET ELIOT WEINBAUM - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney L LISA BATTS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MCCANN, JAMES W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFO SHEET ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
205 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketNOTICE PATERNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketS/O REFERRAL PARENT ED CLASS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketPETITION PATERNTY SUPT MINOR CHILD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2013000110016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE KLINGENSMITH, MARK WAYNE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketCIVFIL CHAPTERS ASSESSED $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/13/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013DR003161

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant