Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 11/03/2020 at 16:23:52 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EST OF GERALD E BRYAN

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EST OF GERALD E BRYAN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2026

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

MCCURLEY AS PR OF THE EST OF GERALD E BRYAN, MARION

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

BRYAN, NICHOLAS

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

MCCURLEY, MARION

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF EST OF GERALD E BRYAN

Guardian Ad Litem

KITE-POWELL, JULIA BLITON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PETTE, ANGELA MARIA

BYARS, DAVID ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

KELLEY, CHRISTOPHER P

 

Court Documents

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

3/18/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

ANSWER - AMENDED

3/18/2020: ANSWER - AMENDED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

1/27/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

1/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/21/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

3/18/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

1/28/2020: RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

CORRESPONDENCE ( V )

1/28/2020: CORRESPONDENCE ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

1/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

ANSWER - NICHOLAS C BRYAN ( V )

11/13/2019: ANSWER - NICHOLAS C BRYAN ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/11/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/30/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketGUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT & MOTION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE & ACCEPTING REPORT OF GAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE - OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketGUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT, MOTION FOR DISCHARGE AND ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS EXTRA NAMES ASSESSED $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/21/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002026

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Christopher P