This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/10/2020 at 14:17:01 (UTC).

TD BANK USA, N.A. vs. SHEPARD, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 TD BANK USA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHEPARD, ROBERT. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1879

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

SHEPARD, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/11/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/11/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/11/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/26/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/22/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT MINUTES ( V )

11/28/2017: COURT MINUTES ( V )

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ( V )

1/17/2018: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ( V )

ORDER TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ( V )

1/17/2018: ORDER TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

1/22/2018: COURT MINUTES ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

2/28/2018: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4103.439 / 4406890) ( V )

3/1/2018: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4103.439 / 4406890) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney FLYNN LAVRAR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4103.439 / 4406890) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/28/2018 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: LAVRAR, FLYNN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017SC001879, TD BANK USA, N.A. VS. SHEPARD, ROBERT - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/11/2017"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/22/2017 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LAVRAR, FLYNN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/11/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017SC001879

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017000075072 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 62684027 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20171011235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant