Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/09/2020 at 12:47:57 (UTC).

TD BANK NA vs. HRABAR, LOUIS

Case Summary

On 08/30/2017 TD BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HRABAR, LOUIS. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1490

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK NA

Defendants

HRABAR, LOUIS

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE

UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

ESTATE OF VIRGINIA HRABAR

UNK HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES ETC.

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

HRABAR, VIRGINIA

Not Yet Classified

MEYER, CRAIG

Trustee

REFUND SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNS, DANIELLE RUNDLETT

Defendant Attorneys

ANON, MANNY JR.

MUGAVERO, PHILIP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

11/9/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/26/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

10/15/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT ( V )

10/15/2018: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

10/10/2018: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

10/3/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V )

8/16/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

6/28/2018: NOTICE OF FILING ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

6/8/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

ORDER GRANTING DISCHARGE AND ATTY'S FEES ( V )

3/6/2018: ORDER GRANTING DISCHARGE AND ATTY'S FEES ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

1/2/2018: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

11/13/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

10/5/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/25/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR 4039 PG 710) ( V )

9/6/2017: LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR 4039 PG 710) ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED-DRBURNS@DUANEMORRIS.COM ( V )

8/31/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED-DRBURNS@DUANEMORRIS.COM ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/30/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/30/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney PHILIP MUGAVERO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney DANIELLE RUNDLETT BURNS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney MANNY ANON JR. - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000051943; Applied Amount; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2019000051943

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketAPPOINTING SURPLUS TRUSTEE ASSESSED $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: REFUND SOLUTIONS LLC - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CA001490, TD BANK NA VS. HRABAR, LOUIS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 3 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NAPP-6/19/2019,CED-10/15/2018,EFFINALJDGF-8/17/2018"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNOTIFYING SURPLUS TRUSTEE ASSESSED $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE APPOINTING SURPLUS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CA001490, TD BANK NA VS. HRABAR, LOUIS - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NTCONM-1/15/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $954.00 RECEIPT #2017000065807 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 61148966 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170831235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/30/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CA001490

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burns, Danielle Rundlett