This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 12/18/2020 at 12:22:42 (UTC).

TAYLOR, JAMES vs. ROBINSON, HEATHER L

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 TAYLOR, JAMES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBINSON, HEATHER L. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1408

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAYLOR, JAMES

TAYLOR, JENNA

Defendant

ROBINSON, HEATHER L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, JOHN DAVIS III

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2020
  • DocketAttorney JOHN DAVIS LEWIS III - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000065749; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: LEWIS, JOHN DAVIS III - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001408, TAYLOR, JAMES VS. ROBINSON, HEATHER L - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/21/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LEWIS, JOHN DAVIS III ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065749 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113616500 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001408

    Read MoreRead Less