This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 12:07:46 (UTC).

STEPHENS, BECKY LYNN vs. STEPHENS, JOHN BARNANAS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 STEPHENS, BECKY LYNN filed an Other lawsuit against STEPHENS, JOHN BARNANAS. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PEGG, ROBERT L and MCHUGH, ELIZABETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3094

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PEGG, ROBERT L

MCHUGH, ELIZABETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEPHENS, BECKY LYNN

Respondent

STEPHENS, JOHN BARNANAS

Not Yet Classified

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CASTRO, HERNAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingEvent: DOR HEARING; Judge: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH; Location: Courtroom 2A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE PEGG, ROBERT L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDOR HEARING SET FOR 03/20/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN 2A/ , HEARING OFFICER: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CASTRO, HERNAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR003094, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE VS. STEPHENS, JOHN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-12/16/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFO SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CASTRO, HERNAN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/16/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR003094

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less