Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/09/2021 at 15:44:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION vs. UNITED PARTNERS III, INC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against UNITED PARTNERS III, INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0840

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Defendants

UNITED PARTNERS III, INC

CITY OF FORT PIERCE

ST. LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

SYNOVUS BANK

MICHAEL S. BONVILLE AND ROXIE L. BONVILLE D/B/A O

MICHAEL S. BONVILLE AND ROXIE L. BONVILLE D/B/A

MICHAEL S. BONVILLE AND ROXIE L. BONVILLE

Not Yet Classified

103/701

103

701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOOT, KEVIN FRAWLEY

Defendant Attorneys

STRATTON, CHARLES STUART

STRATTON, JOSHUA SCOTT

EARLEY, TANYA MARIE

BECHT, EDWARD WILSON

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/18/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT ( V )

12/11/2020: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

12/4/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

11/30/2020: RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

11/30/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

11/24/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

11/19/2020: MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

11/19/2020: MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

11/4/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS ( V )

9/18/2020: MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/26/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED - TO SHOW CAUSE

8/13/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - TO SHOW CAUSE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000085364; Applied Amount; $1,294,600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000085354; Applied Amount; $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,294,600.00 RECEIPT #2020000085364

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMCIRE LEGALLY AUTHORIZED WAIVE $60.0000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketEMINENT DOMAIN LEGALLY AUTHORIZED WAIVE $170.0000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4430.673 / 4716433)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/05/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000840

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF FORT PIERCE is a litigant

Latest cases where SYNOVUS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant