Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/11/2021 at 00:43:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION vs. PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0088

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Defendants

ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

JIM CHILDS TAX SERVICE INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

ST LUCIE COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE S

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF

Not Yet Classified

701

101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, JARED S

Defendant Attorneys

FERGUSON, DORIS GOULD

SMITH, BRIAN EDWARD

MCINTYRE, DANIEL SCOTT

BAGGETT, LEE JAMES

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM FROM ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR REGARDING AD VALOREM TAXES ( V )

5/30/2019: MEMORANDUM FROM ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR REGARDING AD VALOREM TAXES ( V )

ORDER OF TAKING ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4249.2517 / 4547726) ( V )

4/1/2019: ORDER OF TAKING ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4249.2517 / 4547726) ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

3/7/2019: DEFAULT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

3/7/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

3/7/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - PNC BANK ( V )

2/22/2019: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - PNC BANK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

1/18/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

9/4/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

3/7/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

ANSWER ( V ) - BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

2/6/2019: ANSWER ( V ) - BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.2942 / 4521397) ( V )

1/18/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4223.2942 / 4521397) ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

1/18/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

1/15/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

DECLARATION OF TAKING ( V )

1/15/2019: DECLARATION OF TAKING ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

1/15/2019: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISBURSING FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney DORIS GOULD FERGUSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney BRIAN EDWARD SMITH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney DANIEL SCOTT MCINTYRE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney LEE JAMES BAGGETT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney JARED S SILVER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000034273; Applied Amount; $922,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/15/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000088

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. LUCIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant