Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/13/2021 at 02:37:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION vs. MONICA INVESTMENT GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against MONICA INVESTMENT GROUP INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0714

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Defendants

CITY OF FORT PIERCE

ST. LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

SEA WAY PETROLUEM, INC.

HESS CORPORATION F/K/A AMERADA HESS CORPORATION

SCOTT & MAX INC

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

PSL DONUTS LLC D/B/A DUNKIN DONUTS

MONICA INVESTMENT GROUP INC

Not Yet Classified

PARCEL 101

PARCEL 813

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WYDNER, SEAN RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

FERGUSON, DORIS GOULD

NEILL, RICHARD VERNON JR.

POLICASTRO, ANTHONY VINCENT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - SECOND ( V )

2/1/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - SECOND ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

1/29/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION ( V )

10/20/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

7/22/2020: NOTICE OF FILING OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT ( V )

8/31/2020: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

8/20/2020: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

ORDER OF TAKING - Recorded (Other.4457.121 / 4738390)

8/5/2020: ORDER OF TAKING - Recorded (Other.4457.121 / 4738390)

MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS AS TO PARCELS 101/813

7/22/2020: MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS AS TO PARCELS 101/813

ANSWER - CITY OF FT PIERCE

7/13/2020: ANSWER - CITY OF FT PIERCE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

7/1/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

6/19/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

6/17/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

6/17/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

6/9/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER

6/9/2020: ANSWER

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/20/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/20/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/20/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4553.2240 / 4816938) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: STATE OF FL DOT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000714, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION VS. MONICA INVESTMENT GROUP INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-2/1/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO AMEND ANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE - SECOND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - SECOND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WYDNER, SEAN RICHARD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/12/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketEMINENT DOMAIN LEGALLY AUTHORIZED WAIVE $170.0000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketSUMMCIRE LEGALLY AUTHORIZED WAIVE $90.0000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HESS is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF FORT PIERCE is a litigant

Latest cases where ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant