Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/10/2021 at 20:17:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION vs. BERNARD EGAN & COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against BERNARD EGAN COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0868

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Defendants

BERNARD EGAN & COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION

ST. LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

CITY OF FORT PIERCE, A FLORIDA MUNICIPAL CORPORATI

SHM HARBORTOWN, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LI

CITY OF FORT PIERCE

ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS LLC

SHM HARBORTOWN LLC

BERNARD EGAN & COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

PARCEL 115/703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, JARED S

Defendant Attorneys

EARLEY, TANYA MARIE

CONRAD, JAMES MARSHALL

DUKE, CHRISTOPHER S

TOMKIEWICZ, MICHAEL JOSEPH

LUZIETTI, GINO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS FROM REGISTRY, CERTIFIED

10/6/2020: ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS FROM REGISTRY, CERTIFIED

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - EXHIBIT A DUPLICATE FILED IN ERROR

9/24/2020: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING - EXHIBIT A DUPLICATE FILED IN ERROR

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/23/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/23/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/23/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

9/1/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

8/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8/5/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER

7/30/2020: ANSWER

MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS

7/29/2020: MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS

REQUEST FOR HEARING

7/8/2020: REQUEST FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/7/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/23/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4433.2759 / 4719605)

6/17/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4433.2759 / 4719605)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/17/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

6/10/2020: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

DECLARATION

6/10/2020: DECLARATION

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000071994; Applied Amount; $100,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $100,100.00 RECEIPT #2020000071994

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCOURT REGISTRY CLERK FEE CA ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCOURT REGISTRY DEPOSIT CA ASSESSED $100100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISBURSING FUNDS FROM REGISTRY, CERTIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/10/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000868

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF FORT PIERCE is a litigant

Latest cases where ST LUCIE COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Level 3 Communications LLC is a litigant