This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/20/2021 at 18:32:19 (UTC).

ST LUCIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE vs. RIPHIN, JOHN BERNANDO

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 ST LUCIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE filed an Other lawsuit against RIPHIN, JOHN BERNANDO. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1403

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST LUCIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Defendant

RIPHIN, JOHN BERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FETTERMAN, ADAM MARK

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

11/23/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/22/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE ( V )

10/21/2020: COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/21/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SURETY BOND ( V )

10/21/2020: SURETY BOND ( V )

ORDER GRANTING CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

10/2/2020: ORDER GRANTING CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS - AMENDED

9/24/2020: MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS - AMENDED

ORDER ON MOTION ( V ) TO DECLARE PC AFFIDAVITS CONFIDENTIAL

9/22/2020: ORDER ON MOTION ( V ) TO DECLARE PC AFFIDAVITS CONFIDENTIAL

ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE ( V )

9/21/2020: ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE ( V )

ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE ( V )

9/21/2020: ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE ( V )

MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

9/18/2020: MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000075353; Applied Amount; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: FETTERMAN, ADAM MARK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001403, ST LUCIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VS. RIPHIN, JOHN BERNANDO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/22/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020000075353 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 115373717 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201022235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSURETY BOND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001403, ST LUCIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VS. RIPHIN, JOHN BERNANDO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFORDGRANT-10/2/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: FETTERMAN, ADAM MARK ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $1001.00 RECEIPT #2020000065742 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113607216 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PROBABLE CAUSE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001403

    Read MoreRead Less