This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 12/07/2020 at 07:22:00 (UTC).

SPINE & EXTREMITY REHAB CTR INC vs. DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/05/2010 SPINE EXTREMITY REHAB CTR INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARNES, CLIFF. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1574

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARNES, CLIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SPINE & EXTREMITY REHAB CTR INC

DORESCARD, KENOLD

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIGIACOMO, FRANK

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (2DBFH)

9/10/2010: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (2DBFH)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8/5/2010: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/5/2010: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

INTERROGATORIES

8/5/2010: INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

8/5/2010: SUMMONS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT < $2500

8/5/2010: COMPLAINT < $2500

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2019

DocketAttorney FRANK DIGIACOMO - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2010
View Court Documents

DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (2DBFH)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2010

DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2010

HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: BARNES, CLIFF; Location: Courtroom K - SC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

FinancialReceipt #: 2010362079791; Applied Amount; $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010
View Court Documents

DocketINTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketSTYLE OF CASE:SPINE & EXTREMITY REHAB CTR INC (AAO KENOLD DORESCARD) VS DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketSUMMONS ISSUANCE FEE $10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010

DocketASSIGNED TO JUDGE BARNES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2010
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT < $2500

[+] Read More [-] Read Less