This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/23/2023 at 21:00:49 (UTC).

SPELLS, COLTON E vs. LEWIS, ALESSANDRA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 SPELLS, COLTON E filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LEWIS, ALESSANDRA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAUER, SHERWOOD JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2563

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SPELLS, COLTON E

Respondent

LEWIS, ALESSANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

LEMOINE, KENNETH DUANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 01/17/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: WEINBAUM, CHET ELIOT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR002563, SPELLS, COLTON E VS. LEWIS, ALESSANDRA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 4 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/12/2022,SORP-10/12/2022,NTCP-10/12/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CLAIMANT SEEKING PATERNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WEINBAUM, CHET ELIOT ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022000078854 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 158952241 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20221012235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR PATERNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/11/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR002563

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less