This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 11/23/2021 at 07:29:59 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC vs. CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1763

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA

MCWADE, DENNIS

CAMERON, DONALD

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

WINCE, JACQUELINE

NOEL, JASON

THE CLERK OF THE COURT FOR ST LUCIE COUNTY FLORIDA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DENNIS MCWADE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACQUELINE WINCE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JASON NOEL

UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF KAREN NOEL

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF PATRICIA ZELLER

UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2

UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT, JENNIFER MOUSER

Defendant Attorney

POPRAWSKI, SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

11/19/2021: NOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

11/17/2021: NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

11/17/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ( V )

11/17/2021: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ( V )

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM ( V )

11/16/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

11/16/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

11/15/2021: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

11/15/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/15/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/15/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/15/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/15/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/15/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

ANSWER - ST LUCIE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT

11/10/2021: ANSWER - ST LUCIE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT

ANSWER - DENNIS MCWADE ( V )

11/10/2021: ANSWER - DENNIS MCWADE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/5/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/5/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/5/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SCOTT, JENNIFER MOUSER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001763, SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC VS. CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NA-11/19/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK - JACQUELINE WINCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK - FL HOUSING FINANCE CORP ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK - DONALD CAMERON ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK - DENNIS MCWADE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK - CITY OF PSL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/12/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001763

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of the Court of Brwd Cty is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant