This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 06:19:53 (UTC).

SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC vs. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2972

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC

Defendant

ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/9/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/9/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/9/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS

8/10/2022: NOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE

8/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022SC002972, SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC VS. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/10/2022,NTC-8/10/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/10/2022 AT 2:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022000061862 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 154983560 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220810235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/09/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC002972

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH FLORIDA INJURY CONVENIENT CARE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.