This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/16/2023 at 00:44:43 (UTC).

SMITH, ANN MARGARET vs. SMITH, DAVID EUGENE

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 SMITH, ANN MARGARET filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SMITH, DAVID EUGENE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L, MULLINS, LEATHA DAWN, OLDEHOFF, JULIE, DAVID, LEE and BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3387

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

MULLINS, LEATHA DAWN

OLDEHOFF, JULIE

DAVID, LEE

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, ANN MARGARET

Respondent

SMITH, DAVID EUGENE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS ( V )

12/10/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS ( V )

COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

11/24/2015: COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

12/13/2013: FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4213.1100 / 4511348) ( V )

12/14/2018: PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4213.1100 / 4511348) ( V )

FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

8/21/2019: FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY ( V )

7/23/2018: JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY ( V )

JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4160.122 / 4461409) ( V )

7/23/2018: JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4160.122 / 4461409) ( V )

MEDIATION REPORT W/ MED AGREE

7/25/2014: MEDIATION REPORT W/ MED AGREE

PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

12/11/2018: PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

ORDER ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4427.2368 / 4714274) ( V )

6/2/2020: ORDER ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4427.2368 / 4714274) ( V )

ORDER ( V )

6/2/2020: ORDER ( V )

COURT NOTES

6/2/2020: COURT NOTES

AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS ( V )

5/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS ( V )

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT ( V )

5/6/2020: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT ( V )

MOTION FOR EMERGENCY PICK-UP ORDER ( V )

5/5/2020: MOTION FOR EMERGENCY PICK-UP ORDER ( V )

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ( V )

5/5/2020: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

5/5/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) ( V )

5/4/2020: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) ( V )

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2013DR003387, SMITH, ANN MARGARET VS. SMITH, DAVID EUGENE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: TCS-9/27/2021"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketTERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAttorney SHAUN THOMAS PLYMALE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L; Location: Courtroom 4A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4427.2368 / 4714274) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR OTHER-NON IVD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/16/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013DR003387

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • DocketPAYMENT $421.00 RECEIPT #2013000121958 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 8287351 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20131216235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketPETITION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less