This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 01:54:56 (UTC).

SINGH, DARSHANAND vs. SINGH, CHANDRA

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 SINGH, DARSHANAND filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SINGH, CHANDRA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1258

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SINGH, DARSHANAND

Respondent

SINGH, CHANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BISHOP, KRISTEN L

AMES, KRISTEN BISHOP

Respondent Attorney

MCNAMARA, KEVIN LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 08/16/2022 AT 3:20 PM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketORDER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021DR001258, SINGH, DARSHANAND VS. SINGH, CHANDRA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DCMEA-1/29/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BISHOP, KRISTEN L ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021DR001258

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $418.00 RECEIPT #2021000038732 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 126758972 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210513235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA, KEVIN