This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:44:28 (UTC).

SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN AAO KEVIN STOKES vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN AAO KEVIN STOKES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1669

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN AAO KEVIN STOKES

STOKES, KEVIN 3

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/5/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4134.2006 / 4437851) ( V )

5/18/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4134.2006 / 4437851) ( V )

STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4054.842 / 4361254) ( V )

10/18/2017: STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4054.842 / 4361254) ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/18/2017: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

11/7/2017: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

5/18/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/5/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

1/4/2018: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE ( V )

10/18/2017: STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE ( V )

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney CHRISTINA KONTOGIANNIS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney STEPHEN DOUGLAS DEITSCH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney STEPHEN DOUGLAS DEITSCH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4134.2006 / 4437851) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: KONTOGIANNIS, CHRISTINA ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/11/2018 AT 3:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000066781; Applied Amount; $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DEITSCH, STEPHEN DOUGLAS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017SC001669, SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN AAO KEVIN STOKES VS. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/5/2017"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/18/2017 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DEITSCH, STEPHEN DOUGLAS ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/05/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017SC001669

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017000066781 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 61338567 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170905235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant