This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/24/2020 at 15:06:02 (UTC).

SIMONIS, JENNIFER vs. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 SIMONIS, JENNIFER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0013

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMONIS, JENNIFER

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIMON, RONALD M

QUINTANA, KYLE ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

GREENBERG, MARC MASON

 

Court Documents

WITNESS LIST -AMENDED ( V )

11/14/2019: WITNESS LIST -AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF INTENT ( V ) TO USE RECORDS FROM RIVERTSTONE COMMUNITIES

10/24/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT ( V ) TO USE RECORDS FROM RIVERTSTONE COMMUNITIES

NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )

10/14/2019: NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

10/4/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

10/4/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

10/4/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

7/18/2019: NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ( V )

5/3/2019: NOTICE OF COMPLETION OR COMPLIANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/14/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/15/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

ORDER DENYING DEFT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )

9/1/2020: ORDER DENYING DEFT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/5/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY VIDEO DEPO AT TRIAL

7/8/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY VIDEO DEPO AT TRIAL

RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT FILED BY PLTF

7/6/2020: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR JUDGEMENT FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

6/10/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/21/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

2/13/2020: MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

1/8/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 11/10/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/12/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E 4 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
229 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000001006 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 82760947 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190103235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000013

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBERG, MARC MASON