This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/07/2020 at 04:04:50 (UTC).

SILENCIER, KESLINE vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 SILENCIER, KESLINE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2365

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SILENCIER, YOLINE

SILENCIER, KESLINE

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIPERSBURG, KEITH

Defendant Attorney

THAXTON, ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

1/27/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

1/21/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

1/6/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/18/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

12/16/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/10/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

12/10/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/10/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

12/10/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/10/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/10/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/10/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: THAXTON, ROBERT J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000102550; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: PIPERSBURG, KEITH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA002365, SILENCIER, KESLINE VS. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-12/10/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PIPERSBURG, KEITH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BIBERMAN, MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/10/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002365

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000102550 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 100073329 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191210235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less