Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/03/2021 at 07:10:23 (UTC).

LONGO PR, JENNIFER vs. CITY OF PORT ST. LUCIE

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 LONGO PR, JENNIFER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1950

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONGO PR, JENNIFER

Defendants

CULPEPPER & TERPENING INC

JG GLOBAL ENTERPRISES 1 INC

ESTATE OF IDA COLSON

CITY OF PORT ST. LUCIE

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRBY, JEFFREY DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

MACELLONI, DAVIDE

DANIELS, RICHARD GERALD

ELLMYER, ANSLEY MCINTYRE

MILLER, ADAM MICHAEL

FITOS, JOSEPH ROBINSON

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

5/12/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4/9/2021: SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

3/31/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

3/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

3/18/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

3/5/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/24/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/2/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/26/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

1/21/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2020000091162

12/30/2020: PAYMENT $450.00 RECEIPT #2020000091162

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

12/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

12/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

12/24/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 07/20/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER COMPELLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: KIRBY, JEFFREY DAVID ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOTHER CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001950

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CULPEPPER & TERPENING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRBY , JEFFREY D