This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/21/2021 at 04:32:03 (UTC).

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK vs. MURRAY, ROBI A

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK filed an Other lawsuit against MURRAY, ROBI A. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1549

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

MURRAY, ROBI A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBI A MURRAY

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, ON BEHALF OF MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONANO, ALEXZANDER DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4703.847 / 4938025) ( V )

10/14/2021: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4703.847 / 4938025) ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

10/13/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT ( V )

10/13/2021: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT ( V )

MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY ( V )

9/24/2021: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/16/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/16/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

9/16/2021: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4683.2571 / 4922924)

9/15/2021: LIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4683.2571 / 4922924)

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/3/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CHILDREN AND FAMILIES CASE PLAN ( V )

9/2/2021: CHILDREN AND FAMILIES CASE PLAN ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

9/2/2021: LIS PENDENS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/2/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/2/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4703.847 / 4938025) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4683.2571 / 4922924)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHILDREN AND FAMILIES CASE PLAN ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/02/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001549

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONANO, ALEXZANDER DOUGLAS