This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/17/2021 at 04:29:42 (UTC).

SAVAGE, ERICA vs. ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 SAVAGE, ERICA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALDI FLORIDA LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1611

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAVAGE, ERICA

SAVAGE, JAMES

Defendant

ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, JR, HECTOR JR

Defendant Attorneys

GUMMER, JADE MAURICE

LEUNG, KA-HING

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/6/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/6/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/6/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

10/6/2021: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/6/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/17/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/16/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/16/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/16/2021: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

9/16/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

9/16/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/16/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/16/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001611, SAVAGE, ERICA VS. ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOA-10/6/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: GUMMER, JADE MAURICE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000073098; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HERNANDEZ, JR, HECTOR JR - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001611, SAVAGE, ERICA VS. ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/17/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021000073098 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 134744415 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210917235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001611

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDI (FLORIDA) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUMMER JADE M