This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 07/29/2020 at 01:44:13 (UTC).

SANTOS, RICHARD vs. FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 SANTOS, RICHARD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0023

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANTOS, RICHARD

SANTOS, AIMEE

Defendant

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAROLLO, CAROLINE MARIE

Defendant Attorney

WEST, LINDSAY MARIE

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

3/26/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

3/11/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

2/11/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/5/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/5/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/3/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

1/8/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/7/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/7/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

3/25/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

3/24/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF COMPLAINT ( V )

3/9/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF COMPLAINT ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

3/5/2020: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/5/2020: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

1/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

1/11/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

1/9/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/7/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAttorney LINDSAY MARIE WEST - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAttorney CAROLINE MARIE CAROLLO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAttorney CAROLINE MARIE CAROLLO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CAROLLO, CAROLINE MARIE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000023, SANTOS, RICHARD VS. FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/8/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CAROLLO, CAROLINE MARIE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000002471 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 101278120 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200108235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less