Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 06/07/2021 at 14:45:12 (UTC).

SAMUELS, ZHANE vs. RAMCO MULCH SOLUTIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 SAMUELS, ZHANE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAMCO MULCH SOLUTIONS LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0013

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIVERA, MARIA

SAMUELS, ZHANE

Defendants

YOUNCE, BROCK

RAMCO MULCH SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELL, ALFRED RUSSELL JR.

Defendant Attorneys

COSBY, JEFFREY CHRISTOPHER

BRYANT, PATRICK GROOVER

ESPOSITO, JANELLE LOUISE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

5/20/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

5/19/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/5/2021: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

4/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4/28/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

4/28/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

4/6/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - AMENDED

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/30/2021: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

3/29/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

PRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

3/4/2021: PRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/4/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/26/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/25/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

MOTION TO STRIKE- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

2/19/2021: MOTION TO STRIKE- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/8/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/4/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/5/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/5/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ZHANE SAMUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000013

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPOSITO, JANELLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK GROOVER BRYANT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSBY JEFFREY C