This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 07/14/2020 at 06:34:21 (UTC).

SALCEDO, JORGE vs. CENTAURI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 SALCEDO, JORGE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CENTAURI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0072

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SALCEDO, JORGE

LIND SALCEDO, YNGRID

Defendant

CENTAURI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTINEZ, PERCY

Defendant Attorney

KAPLAN, JONAH D

 

Court Documents

ORDER COMPELLING

6/24/2020: ORDER COMPELLING

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/3/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFTS ( V )

3/6/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFTS ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/6/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

3/6/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/12/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/20/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

1/20/2020: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/15/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

COURT NOTES

5/1/2020: COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/24/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO COMPEL

4/21/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION - TO ABATE

4/7/2020: MOTION - TO ABATE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

4/3/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

3/6/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

3/6/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

3/6/2020: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION ( V )

1/20/2020: REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION ( V )

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: PARTIES FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER COMPELLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 06/24/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE W ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF ABATEMENT - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 05/01/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000005206; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MARTINEZ, PERCY - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000072, SALCEDO, JORGE VS. CENTAURI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/16/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000005206 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 101691773 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200116235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/15/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000072

    Read MoreRead Less