This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 06:54:42 (UTC).

SAGE, LEE vs. FREEDMAN, EILEEN T

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 SAGE, LEE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against FREEDMAN, EILEEN T. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0107

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAGE, LEE

Defendants

FREEDMAN, EILEEN T

TINSMAN, ROBERT S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KIRSCHNER, JONATHAN JAY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

9/12/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

4/4/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

4/4/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

3/18/2019: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

3/15/2019: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

3/12/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

1/17/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS THE MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

11/21/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS THE MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

5/16/2019: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

5/16/2019: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

3/4/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING LETTER ( V )

2/7/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING LETTER ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

2/6/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/17/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS THE MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES/COSTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketOTHER CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/17/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000107

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRSCHNER, JONATHAN JAY