This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/01/2022 at 20:30:27 (UTC).

ROSENZWEIG, GARY vs. FORREST, GARY LAMAR

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 ROSENZWEIG, GARY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FORREST, GARY LAMAR. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1325

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSENZWEIG, GARY

Defendants

FORREST, GARY LAMAR

RIDGEWAY PLUMBING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTUNDA, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

PETERFRIEND, WILLIAM J

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/20/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/8/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION-SECOND AMENDED

11/11/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION-SECOND AMENDED

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

10/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

10/7/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

10/7/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/7/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/7/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

10/7/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION-SECOND AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS BY AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022000057299 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 153878497 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220725235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ROTUNDA, CHRISTOPHER M ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/22/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001325

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIDGEWAY PLUMBING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterfriend, William J