This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/12/2021 at 02:47:31 (UTC).

ROLLE, LOVITA vs. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 ROLLE, LOVITA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1544

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROLLE, LOVITA

Defendant

WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL, DAVID SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

MANZO, CHRISTINE MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

11/10/2020: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

11/10/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

11/5/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

11/2/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/2/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/21/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/14/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

10/14/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/14/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/14/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

10/14/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/14/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/14/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney CHRISTINE MICHELLE MANZO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney DAVID SCOTT MITCHELL - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MITCHELL, DAVID SCOTT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001544

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000072940 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 114934646 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201014235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monza, Christine Michelle